This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2021 at 11:00:25 (UTC).

Evens v. Connolly et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Evens filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Connolly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana L. Christensen and Kathleen L. DeSoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

Referral Judge

Kathleen L. DeSoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rachel Evans

Florence, MT 59833

Rachel Evens

Florence, MT 59833

Defendants

Jeffrey R. Connolly

David Gilbertson

Mark Salter

Janine Kern

Steven Jensen

Patricia DeVaney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Nathan D. Bilyeu

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 N Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601-4298

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #4

Exhibit 3

10 #3

Exhibit 2

10 #2

Exhibit 1

10 #1

Brief

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

#3

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal filed by Jeffrey R. Connolly, Patricia DeVaney, David Gilbertson, Steven Jensen, Janine Kern, Mark Salter. (Bilyeu, Nathan) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal filed by Rachel Evens. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (TAG) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE filed by Rachel Evens (TAG) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. Mailed to Evens (TAG) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Rachel Evens. (TAG) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service filed by Rachel Evens. (TAG) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal filed by Jeffrey R. Connolly, Patricia DeVaney, David Gilbertson, Steven Jensen, Janine Kern, Mark Salter. (Bilyeu, Nathan) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Nathan D. Bilyeu appearing for Defendants Jeffrey R. Connolly, Patricia DeVaney, David Gilbertson, Steven Jensen, Janine Kern, Mark Salter Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Bilyeu, Nathan) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint. Mailed to Evans with docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (TAG) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX4-34686 (TAG) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rachel Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan D. Bilyeu