This case was last updated from PACER on 02/06/2021 at 12:02:51 (UTC).

Evans et al v. DOC Commissions et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Evans filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against DOC Commissions. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01663

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kwai Tilghman

Wilmington, DE 19809

Dayquan Hargroves

Wilmington, DE 19809

Jamar Robbins

Wilmington, DE 19809

Francisco Lanzo

Wilmington, DE 19809

Zyair Carter

Wilmington, DE 19809

Darren Phelps

Wilmington, DE 19809

Mark Herring

Wilmington, DE 19809

Christian Carr

Wilmington, DE 19809

William Kessler

Wilmington, DE 19809

Shyhiem Washington

Wilmington, DE 19809

James Boggs

Wilmington, DE 19809

Anthony Jackson

Wilmington, DE 19809

Yusuf Mccaddy

Wilmington, DE 19809

Eric Harris

Wilmington, DE 19809

Michael Dwyer

Wilmington, DE 19809

Michael Evans

Wilmington, DE 19809

Robert Wheeler

Wilmington, DE 19809

Peirson Wilson

Wilmington, DE 19809

Defendants

Governor John Carney

All Wardens of the State of Delaware's Penitentaries

19 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Trust Fund Account Statement by Paul Sullivan (sam) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Paul Sullivan. (sam) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#20

(#20) Trust Fund Account Statement with attachments by Gregory Scott Huntzberry (myr) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Gregory Scott Huntzberry. (myr) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#18

(#18) Letter/MOTION Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff - Filed by Maurice A. Backus (non-party). (kmd) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#17

(#17) Additional page re D.I. #13 Amended Complaint by Michael Evans. (myr) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit

#13

(#17) Additional page re D.I. #13 Amended Complaint by Michael Evans. (myr) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#10

(#15) Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Nicholas S. Novak (D.I. #10 ), Not in facility. (sam) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#8

(#8) Letter (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Rudolph B. Tyler (non-party). (mal) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#7

(#7) Affidavit in Support of DI #1 Complaint filed by Jamar Perrigan (apk) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#6

(#6) Affidavit (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Nicholas S. Novak (non-party). (sam) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#5

(#5) Affidavit (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Jalier Johnson (non-Party). (sam) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Affidavit (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Gregory Scott Huntzberry (non-party). (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Affidavit in Support of DI #1 - re #1 Complaint. (apk) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#7) Affidavit in Support of DI #1 Complaint filed by Jamar Perrigan (apk) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Trust Fund Account Statement by Paul Sullivan (sam) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Paul Sullivan. (sam) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Trust Fund Account Statement with attachments by Gregory Scott Huntzberry (myr) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Gregory Scott Huntzberry. (myr) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Letter/MOTION Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff - Filed by Maurice A. Backus (non-party). (kmd) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Additional page re D.I. #13 Amended Complaint by Michael Evans. (myr) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Address Update provided by DE Department of Corrections, RE: Nicholas S. Novak. DI #10 has been re-mailed to updated address. (apk) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark: Inmate forwarding address request sent to DDOC. See D.I. #15 (sam) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Nicholas S. Novak (D.I. #10 ), Not in facility. (sam) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Michael Evans. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(apk) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Paul Sullivan (non-party). (apk) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Rudolph B. Tyler (non-party). (mal) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit in Support of DI #1 Complaint filed by Jamar Perrigan (apk) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Nicholas S. Novak (non-party). (sam) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Jalier Johnson (non-Party). (sam) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit (MOTION) Requesting to be Added as a Plaintiff filed by Gregory Scott Huntzberry (non-party). (sam) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit in Support of DI #1 - re #1 Complaint. (apk) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against All Wardens of the State of Delaware's Penitentaries, John Carney, DOC Commissions - filed by Adrian Spence, Kwai Tilghman, Chaka Maddrey, Tyrell Loper, Eric Harris, Michael Evans, Robert Dunnum, Robert Wheeler, Gerald Medkeff, Timane Dollard, Anthony Jackson, Tyson Beckett, Peirson Wilson, Darren Phelps, Kalvin Benjamin, James Boggs, Alphonso Williams, Francisco Lanzo, Arturo Juarez, Dayquan Hargroves, Michael Inwold, Zyair Carter, Mark Herring, William Kessler, Shyhiem Washington, Christian Carr, Jamar Robbins, Dameyin Johnson, Yusuf Mccaddy, Michael Dwyer, Jamar Perrigan.(NO FEE PAID)(NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(apk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor John Carney is a litigant