This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 09:58:43 (UTC).

E.V. et al v. United HealthCare Oxford et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 E filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Crotty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02855

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Crotty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

E. V.

L. V.

Defendants

United Healthcare Oxford

United Behavorial Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Smith King

Attorney at Brian S. King, Attorney at Law

420 E. South Temple, Suite 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Robert Lawrence Liebross

Attorney at Law Office of Robert L. Liebross

259-27 148Th Drive

Rosedale, NY 11422

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Tera L. Peterson

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Shmuel Kadosh

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP (NYC)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Bradley Ross Blackham

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Rebecca R. Hanson

Attorney at Reed Smith

10 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Mia McDonald

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 S Wacker Dr., Ste 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/2/2022) (ks) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#44

(#44) PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by United Behavorial Health, United Healthcare Oxford..(Kadosh, Shmuel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#43

(#43) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan, submitted in accordance with Rule 26(f), Fed. R. Civ. P., is adopted as the Scheduling Order of this Court in accordance with Rule 16(f), Fed. R. civ. P. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 10/14/2022. All Fact Discovery due by 7/18/2022. The next Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/05/2022) (ama) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#42

(#42) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Brian S. King and Samuel Kadosh dated May 5 2022 re: May 5, 2022 Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by E. V., L. V...(King, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#41

(#41) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by E. V., L. V...(King, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

39 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

39 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

39 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Brian S. King

39 #39

Main Document

#7

(#9) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #7 filed by Defendants United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford (English, Maralyn) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert C. Deegan, for Defendants United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Respons

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. V., L. V. as to United HealthCare Oxford Waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. V., L. V. as to United Behavorial Health Waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs E. V., L. V. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/2/2022) (ks) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by United Behavorial Health, United Healthcare Oxford..(Kadosh, Shmuel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan, submitted in accordance with Rule 26(f), Fed. R. Civ. P., is adopted as the Scheduling Order of this Court in accordance with Rule 16(f), Fed. R. civ. P. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 10/14/2022. All Fact Discovery due by 7/18/2022. The next Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/05/2022) (ama) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/5/2022. REMARK: Counsel for both sides appeared. The parties provided a status report and the Court adjourned the matter to September 8, 2022 at 11:30AM. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Sadie Herbert) (dgo) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Brian S. King and Samuel Kadosh dated May 5 2022 re: May 5, 2022 Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by E. V., L. V...(King, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by E. V., L. V...(King, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER granting #39 Motion for Brian S. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Brian S. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26035055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION for Brian S. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26035055. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by E. V., L. V.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian S. King, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(King, Brian) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Motion for Mia C. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Uniteds' ANSWER to Complaint filed by United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford.(English, Maralyn) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #7 filed by Defendants United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford (English, Maralyn) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #7 filed by Plaintiffs E. V., L. V. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/5/21. (ss) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert C. Deegan, for Defendants United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Responses to Complaint) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United Behavorial Health(pty:dft), Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United HealthCare Oxford(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. V., L. V. as to United HealthCare Oxford Waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. V., L. V. as to United Behavorial Health Waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4107175) filed by E. V., L. V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs E. V., L. V. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) [Transferred from Utah on 4/7/2022.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMUEL KADOSH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R. Hanson