This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2021 at 20:39:32 (UTC).

Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor v. SRS, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U S Department of Labor filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SRS, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are George W. Cannon, Jr and Wilma A. Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor

201 Varick Street, Room 983

New York, NY 10014

Defendants

SRS, Inc.

106 Public Square, Suites 203-207

Gallatin, TN 37066

Charles Pickett

Terry, MS 39170

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frances Yung Ho Ma

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

201 Varick Street, Room 983

New York, NY 10014

Defendant Attorney

Adriane J. Dudley

Attorney at Dudley & Rich

5194 Dronningens Gade, Suite 3

St. Thomas, VI 00802

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #1

Proposed Consent Judgment

#15

14 #3

Certificate of Service

14 #2

Proposed Consent Judgment

14 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Approve Consent Judgment

#14

13 #1

Proposed Consent Judgment

#13

#12

#11

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#9

#8

#6

#5

#3

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor re #15 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment , #16 Memorandum in Support to Motion (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Judgment) (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Memorandum in support is not an attachment, it's a separate entry. Please re-file. Re: #14 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment . (KAB) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, #2 Proposed Consent Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service) (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #13 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment . Document and PDF don't match. (TNS) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Judgment) (Ma, Frances) Modified on 1/14/2021 (TNS). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER (GWC) dated 12/4/2020 granting #11 Request for Extension. Defendants' deadline to answer Complaint is EXTENDED without date. Parties shall file proposed Consent Judgment by 1/8/2021. (KMD) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (GWC) dated 10/26/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of the parties' #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time, it is now hereby ORDERED that the stipulation is ACCEPTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including December 4, 2020, within which to file an answer(s) or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION re 7 Order, For Extension of Time by Charles Pickett, SRS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dudley, Adriane) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Adriane J. Dudley on behalf of Defendants Charles Pickett, SRS, Inc. (Dudley, Adriane) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER (GWC) dated 9/9/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of the parties' #6 Stipulation, it is now hereby ORDERED that the stipulation is ACCEPTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including November 2, 2020, within which to file an answer(s) or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses and Complaint served on Adriane Dudley and Darrell Gay on behalf of all defendants on 9/9/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to SRS, Inc.. (TNS) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Charles Pickett. (TNS) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SRS, Inc. Summons, #3 Charles Pickett Summons) # 4 [Exhibit A] (Ma, Frances) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary, US Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where SRS Inc is a litigant