This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2020 at 10:06:37 (UTC).

Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor, v. Olszewski, et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U S Department of Labor filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Olszewski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00660

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor,

Eugene Scalia

Defendants

Area Wide Realty Corporation Cash Balance Pension Plan and Trust,

Michael Olszewski,

and Area Wide Realty Corporation Profit Sharing Plan and Trust,

Area Wide Realty Corporation,

Area Wide Realty Corporation Profit Sharing Plan and Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barbara Mariela Villalobos

Attorney at United States Department of Labor

230 South Dearborn Street, 8Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

2 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#2

(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 4/16/2020. Status hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor,; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 4/16/2020. Status hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor,; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Villalobos, Barbara) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary, US Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara Villalobos