This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2021 at 08:26:11 (UTC).

Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor v. Data Management Group of Virginia, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U S Department of Labor filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Data Management Group of Virginia, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Beach Smith and Lawrence R. Leonard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Beach Smith

Referral Judge

Lawrence R. Leonard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor

Defendants

Data Management Group of Virginia, Inc.

Keith Boyer

DMG 401K Plan

Data Management Group of Virginia Dental Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryma Naje Lewis

Attorney at US Department of Labor

201 12Th Street South, Suite 401

Arlington, VA 22202

Patrick Michael Dalin

Attorney at U. S. Department of Labor - Office of the Regional Solicitor

1835 Market St, Mail Stop Sol/22

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2968

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint; further that defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 1/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on December 22, 2020. (sche) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

17 #1

Proposed Order DMG

#17

(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DMG)(Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

16 #3

Affidavit of Service - DMG Inc.

16 #2

Affidavit of Service - DMG Dental Plan

16 #1

Affidavit of Service - DMG 401K

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - DMG 401K, #2 Affidavit of Service - DMG Dental Plan, #3 Affidavit of Service - DMG Inc.)(Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/06/2020)

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Procedure for Civil Motions, Motions to Determined without Oral Argument; Notice; and Complaint served on Keith Boyer on 12/01/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Procedure for Civil Motions, Motions to Determined without Oral Argument; Notice; and Complaint served on Data Management Group of Virginia, Inc. on 12/01/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons Data Management Group of Virginia, Inc. by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons Data Management Group of Virginia Dental Plan by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons DMG 401K Plan by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons Boyer by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Patrick Michael Dalin as to Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 11/9/20. (tlev, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#3

(#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Patrick Michael Dalin as to Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 11/9/20. (tlev, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#2

Notice of Correction re #2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Dalin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. (tlev, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet DMG, et al.

#1

(#1) Complaint , filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet DMG, et al.)(Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint; further that defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 1/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on December 22, 2020. (sche) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Leonard. #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (mrees, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DMG)(Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - DMG 401K, #2 Affidavit of Service - DMG Dental Plan, #3 Affidavit of Service - DMG Inc.)(Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Procedure for Civil Motions, Motions to Determined without Oral Argument; Notice; and Complaint served on Keith Boyer on 12/01/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Procedure for Civil Motions, Motions to Determined without Oral Argument; Notice; and Complaint served on Data Management Group of Virginia, Inc. on 12/01/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Procedure for Civil Motions, Motions to Determined without Oral Argument; Notice; and Complaint served on DMG 401K Plan on 12/01/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Procedure for Civil Motions, Motions to Determined without Oral Argument; Notice; and Complaint served on Data Management Group of Virginia Dental Plan on 12/01/2020, filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice for Patrick Michael Dalin as to Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 11/20/20. (tlev, ) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Dalin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons Data Management Group of Virginia, Inc. by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons Data Management Group of Virginia Dental Plan by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons DMG 401K Plan by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons Boyer by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Patrick Michael Dalin as to Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 11/9/20. (tlev, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Dalin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Dalin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. (tlev, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Dalin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint , filed by Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet DMG, et al.)(Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DMG Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary, US Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryma Lewis