This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2021 at 10:49:55 (UTC).

Eugene Griffith et al v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Eugene Griffith filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01381

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helena M. Barch-Kuchta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eugene Griffith

Frances Griffith

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David N. Barry

Attorney at The Barry Law Firm

11845 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Millard Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates, Gonter, Guy, Proudfoot & Muench

38 Discovery, Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Notice of Appearance

1 #5

Notice Of Interested Parties

1 #6

Declaration of M. Proudfoot ISO Notice of Removal

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Standing Order

2 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

2 #3

Consent Form

2 #4

VDRP

#3

(#3) REQUEST for Substitution of Attorney by FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #3 Defendant's substitution of counsel pursuant to Local Rule 182(g). Jon Universal shall replace Matthew M. Proudfoot as counsel of record for Defendant FCA US LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/22/2021. (Adams, E) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for Substitution of Attorney by FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno, case number 21CECG02224 by Eugene Griffith, Frances Griffith. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9819704) (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice Of Interested Parties, #6 Declaration of M. Proudfoot ISO Notice of Removal)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Millard Proudfoot