This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 10:46:34 (UTC).

Eubanks v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Eubanks filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry T. Wingate and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Eubanks

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

John and Jane Does 1-4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William G. Shields

Attorney at SHIELDS GOODSON, PLLC

P. O. Box 707, 555 Tombigbee St., Ste. 100 (Jackson - 39201)

Madison, MS 39130

Defendant Attorneys

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Rajita Iyer Moss

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#7

(#7) First NOTICE of Service of Discovery Request for Production by Diane Eubanks (Shields, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#6

(#6) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Moss, Rajita) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Caroline Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart

1 #2

Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Yazoo County Circuit Court, MS, case number 82CI1:20-cv-61. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4498657) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for April 14, 2021 is hereby cancelled at the request of the parties. The parties are directed to contact the Court on or around May 7, 2021 to reset the TCMC, and/or provide a status update.(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First NOTICE of Service of Discovery Request for Production by Diane Eubanks (Shields, William) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Moss, Rajita) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Caroline Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Yazoo County Circuit Court, MS, case number 82CI1:20-cv-61. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4498657) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William G. Shields