This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2019 at 04:45:38 (UTC).

ETZWEILER v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by ETZWEILER against AMAZON COM, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04736

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER

Defendants

AMAZON.COM, INC.

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER. (LEASE, ADAM) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(FEENEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIANA L. SIGNS on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SIGNS, CHRISTIANA) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/22/2019. 10/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER (LEASE, ADAM) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(kw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT AMAZON.COM, INC..(kw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County, PA, Certificate of Service, case number 2019-22318. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE205102)(kw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER. (LEASE, ADAM) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(FEENEY, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIANA L. SIGNS on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SIGNS, CHRISTIANA) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/22/2019. 10/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. LEASE on behalf of THOMAS GLENN ETZWEILER (LEASE, ADAM) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(kw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT AMAZON.COM, INC..(kw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County, PA, Certificate of Service, case number 2019-22318. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE205102)(kw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.