This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:32:28 (UTC).

Etsell v. Pfizer Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Etsell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Pfizer Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81838

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ted Etsell

Defendants

Pfizer Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Sanofi S.A.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Sanofi US Services Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline plc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Anthony Osborne

Attorney at Osborne & Francis

433 Plaza Real, Suite 271

Boca Raton, FL 33432

J. Robert Bell, III

Attorney at Osborne , Associates Law Firm, P.A.

433 Plaza Real Suite 271

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#17

(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81838-RLR Etsell v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline plc, Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15055511, filed by Ted Etsell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant

Latest cases where Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant