This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2021 at 08:37:21 (UTC).

Etsell et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 Etsell filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00724

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan Etsell

Sarah Etsell

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kindra N Dotson-Avila

Attorney at Russell Legal Group

2201 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Rachel L Bussett

Attorney at Bussett Legal Group PLLC

2201 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Defendant Attorneys

Lance E Leffel

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

499 W Sheridan Ave, Bok Park Plaza

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Prescott E Kiplinger

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

499 W Sheridan Ave, Bok Park Plaza

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address by Prescott E Kiplinger (Kiplinger, Prescott) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Lance E Leffel (Leffel, Lance) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L Bussett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bussett, Rachel) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Dotson-Avila, Kindra) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Negligence Claim filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Leffel, Lance) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Kindra N Dotson-Avila on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dotson-Avila, Kindra) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Negligence Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dotson-Avila, Kindra) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Negligence Claim by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Leffel, Lance) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Leffel, Lance) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Prescott E Kiplinger on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Kiplinger, Prescott) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Leffel, Lance) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Lance E Leffel on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Leffel, Lance) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-2021-65 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Annual Report, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjs). (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance E Leffel