This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2023 at 09:17:53 (UTC).

Ethor IP Corporation v. HungerRush LLC

Case Summary

On 03/10/2023 Ethor IP Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HungerRush LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00913

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ethor IP Corporation

Defendants

Menufy.com LLC

HungerRush LLC

Revention

OrderingIn.com LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Tatum Lee

Cabrach John Connor

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Ethor IP Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons in a Patent Case. Initial Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the original complaint is 05/05/2023.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint by Ethor IP Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#9

(#9) RETURN of Service, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

6 #1

Complaint

#6

(#6) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cabrach J. Connor on behalf of Ethor IP Corporation, filed. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethor IP Corporation, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Ethor IP Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons in a Patent Case. Initial Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the original complaint is 05/05/2023.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint by Ethor IP Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) RETURN of Service, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) RETURN of Service, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) RETURN of Service, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Cabrach J. Connor on behalf of Ethor IP Corporation, filed. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethor IP Corporation, filed.(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29586144) filed by Ethor IP Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less