This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2020 at 11:17:24 (UTC).

Ethiopian Airlines v. Alemayehu et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Ethiopian Airlines filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Alemayehu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01273

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ethiopian Airlines

Defendants

Hencock Alemayehu

Ze Habesha, LLC

Henok A Degfu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick T Tierney

Attorney at Collins Buckley Sauntry & Haugh PLLP

332 Minnesota St Ste W 1100

St Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Andreleita Walker

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

80 S. 8Th St., Ste 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lauren P. Russell

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1909 K Street, Nw, 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Derege Demissie

Attorney at Demissie & Church

929 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 101

Cambridge, MA 02139

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Derege Demissie. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7820159 filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Russell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7820090 filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Andreleita Walker on behalf of Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethiopian Airlines. Ze Habesha, LLC served on 5/30/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Tierney, Patrick) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethiopian Airlines. Hencock Alemayehu served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Tierney, Patrick) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (lmb) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines

#2

(#1) ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT DKT #2 . COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7757345) filed by Ethiopian Airlines. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines) (Tierney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines

#1

(#1) ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT DKT #2 . COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7757345) filed by Ethiopian Airlines. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines) (Tierney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lauren P. Russell for Hencock Alemayehu and for Ze Habesha, LLC.; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Derege Demissie for Hencock Alemayehu and for Ze Habesha, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/26/2020. (JGK) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Derege Demissie. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7820159 filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Russell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7820090 filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Court finds good cause for a 60-day extension of time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Accordingly, Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/17/2020. (ALM) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Andreleita Walker on behalf of Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethiopian Airlines. Ze Habesha, LLC served on 5/30/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Tierney, Patrick) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethiopian Airlines. Hencock Alemayehu served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Tierney, Patrick) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (lmb) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1273 (ECT/HB). (lmb) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7757416) filed by Ethiopian Airlines. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tierney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT DKT #2 . COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7757345) filed by Ethiopian Airlines. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines) (Tierney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less