This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2020 at 08:53:25 (UTC).

Ethic Inc. v. Admirals Bancorp, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Ethic Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Admirals Bancorp, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10581

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ethic Inc.

Defendants

Ethic Wealth Advisors LLC

Admirals Bancorp, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam S. Gershenson

Attorney at Cooley LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116-3736

Defendant Attorney

John W. Crittenden

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John W. Crittenden Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8173041 by Ethic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gershenson, Adam) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Admirals Bancorp, Inc., Ethic Wealth Advisors LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethic Inc.. (Gershenson, Adam) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8168233 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ethic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Gershenson, Adam) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John W. Crittenden. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John W. Crittenden Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8173041 by Ethic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gershenson, Adam) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docket(#5) Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 6/22/2020. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Admirals Bancorp, Inc., Ethic Wealth Advisors LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethic Inc.. (Gershenson, Adam) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8168233 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ethic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Gershenson, Adam) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less