This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 07:00:38 (UTC).

Etheridge v. Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Etheridge filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04023

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gretta Etheridge

Defendants

Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy

National Park Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrey R. Yurtsan

Attorney at Louis/White PC

1851 Heritage Lane, Suite 148

Sacramento, CA 95819

Jamil Louis White

Attorney at Louis White and Associates

1851 Heritage Lane, Suite 148

Sacramento, CA 95815

Defendant Attorney

Kara Lianne Wild

Attorney at Ericksen Arbuthnot

2300 Clayton Road, Suite 350

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy.. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/17/2019) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#9

(#9) Golden Gate National Park Conservancy ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGolden Gate National Parks Conservancy. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/25/2019) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gretta Etheridge.. (White, Jamil) (Filed on 7/17/2019) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy . (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 USC 1441 BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL PARK CONSERVANCY from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-573443. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13514857). Filed byGolden Gate National Parks Conservancy. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Golden Gate National Park Conservancy ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGolden Gate National Parks Conservancy. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/25/2019) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gretta Etheridge.. (White, Jamil) (Filed on 7/17/2019) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy.. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/17/2019) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Golden Gate National Parks Conservancy . (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 USC 1441 BY DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL PARK CONSERVANCY from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-573443. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13514857). Filed byGolden Gate National Parks Conservancy. (Wild, Kara) (Filed on 7/12/2019) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.