This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2021 at 08:05:46 (UTC).

Estrada v. Bill Davis Trucking Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Estrada filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bill Davis Trucking Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jodi W. Dishman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jodi W. Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Estrada

Defendants

Roger Lynn Canard

IAT Insurance Group

Bill Davis Trucking Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D Denton, Jr

Attorney at Denton Law Firm PC

925 West State Highway 152

Mustang, OK 73064

Austin C Walters

Attorney at Denton Law Firm PC

925 West State Highway 152

Mustang, OK 73064

Defendant Attorney

James W Dobbs

Attorney at Hunter & Co Law PLLC

915 N Robinson Ave, Po Box 928

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance - Dobbs

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Return of Service - Canard

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Return of Service - IAT

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff David Estrada. (Walters, Austin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Walters, Austin) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by James W Dobbs (Dobbs, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL SCHEDULING/STATUS CONFERENCE DOCKET. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 502 before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 4/21/2021. (nv) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants.(Dobbs, James) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Bill Davis Trucking Inc . (Dobbs, James) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Walters, Austin) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D Denton, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denton, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Austin C Walters on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Walters, Austin) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by IAT Insurance Group . (Dobbs, James) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by James W Dobbs on behalf of All Defendants (Dobbs, James) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3604569. (Dobbs, James) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-269 filed by IAT Insurance Group, Roger Lynn Canard, Bill Davis Trucking Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service - IAT, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service - Canard, #5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance - Dobbs, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IAT Insurance Group is a litigant