This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 09:12:34 (UTC).

Estevez v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Estevez filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00428

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michelle Estevez

Fort Worth, TX 76127

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Margaret C. Nammar

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Hawaii

300 Ala Moana Blvd., Rm. 6-100

Honolulu, HI 96850

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) EO: COURT ORDER DENYING AS MOOT: DEFENDANT'S "EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT ERROR RULE 36 AND 1651 MOTION"; AND THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER re #1 , #3 as to Michelle Estevez. (CR 15-00294 LEK-02, CV 20-00428 LEK-KJM) IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (emt, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Margaret C. Nammar appearing for Respondent United States of America (Nammar, Margaret) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

1 #7

Mailing Documentation

1 #6

Transmittal Letter, dated September 29, 2020

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

*Restricted*

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Emergency Motion to Correct Error Rule 36 and or 1651 Motion) - filed by Michelle Estevez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (RESTRICTED) , #3 Exhibit C (SEALED) , #4 Exhibit D (SEALED) , #5 Exhibit E, #6 Transmittal Letter, dated September 29, 2020, #7 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) Modified on 10/6/2020 - Exhibits B, C and D are comprised of Presentence Investigation Reports from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, the Northern District of California and the District of Hawaii. The referenced exhibits have been restricted to case participants and the court(emt, ). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 EO: COURT ORDER DENYING AS MOOT: DEFENDANT'S "EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT ERROR RULE 36 AND 1651 MOTION"; AND THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER has been served by First Class Mail to Michelle Estevez at the address of record on November 25, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EO: COURT ORDER DENYING AS MOOT: DEFENDANT'S "EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT ERROR RULE 36 AND 1651 MOTION"; AND THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER re #1 , #3 as to Michelle Estevez. (CR 15-00294 LEK-02, CV 20-00428 LEK-KJM) IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (emt, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Margaret C. Nammar appearing for Respondent United States of America (Nammar, Margaret) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of ECF No. #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) with the Civil Number affixed, and ECF No. 2 Notice of Case Assignment has been served by First Class Mail to Michelle Estevez at the address of record on October 7, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00428 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. All filings related to the MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) shall be filed only in CR 15-00294 LEK-02, USA v. Michelle Estevez. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Emergency Motion to Correct Error Rule 36 and or 1651 Motion) - filed by Michelle Estevez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (RESTRICTED) , #3 Exhibit C (SEALED) , #4 Exhibit D (SEALED) , #5 Exhibit E, #6 Transmittal Letter, dated September 29, 2020, #7 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) Modified on 10/6/2020 - Exhibits B, C and D are comprised of Presentence Investigation Reports from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, the Northern District of California and the District of Hawaii. The referenced exhibits have been restricted to case participants and the court(emt, ). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less