This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:29:25 (UTC).

Estevez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 Estevez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George B. Daniels and Robert W. Lehrburger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11665

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

Referral Judge

Robert W. Lehrburger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brunilda Rosario Estevez

New York, NY 10033

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Amanda Frances Parsels

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER OF SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall notify the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York of the filing of this prose case, brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), for which the filing fee has been waived. In accordance with the Standing Order "Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases," 16-MC-0171 (Apr. 20, 2016): Within 90 days of the date of this order, the Commissioner must serve and file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR), which will constitute the Commissioner's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, the Commissioner must do so within 60 days of the date on which thee-CAR was filed. The motion must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and a full description of the underlying administrative proceeding. Plaintiff must file an answering brief within 60 days of the filing of the Commissioner's motion. The Commissioner may file a reply within 21 days thereafter. Memoranda in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion may not exceed 25 pages in length; reply memoranda may not exceed ten pages in length. A party seeking to exceed these page limitations must apply to the Court for leave to do so, with copies to all counsel, no fewer than seven days before the date on which the memorandum is due. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 4/13/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/13/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/13/2020) (js) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/10/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Frances Parsels on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Parsels, Amanda) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SOCIAL SECURITY PACKAGE MAILED to Brunilda Rosario Estevez 809 West 177th Street Apt. 4F New York, NY 10033, at, on 1/13/2020 Re: #7 Order of Service - Social Security. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), in social security cases only, a flyer about pro bono attorneys available through the New York County Lawyers' Association. (nb) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall notify the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York of the filing of this prose case, brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), for which the filing fee has been waived. In accordance with the Standing Order "Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases," 16-MC-0171 (Apr. 20, 2016): Within 90 days of the date of this order, the Commissioner must serve and file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR), which will constitute the Commissioner's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, the Commissioner must do so within 60 days of the date on which thee-CAR was filed. The motion must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and a full description of the underlying administrative proceeding. Plaintiff must file an answering brief within 60 days of the filing of the Commissioner's motion. The Commissioner may file a reply within 21 days thereafter. Memoranda in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion may not exceed 25 pages in length; reply memoranda may not exceed ten pages in length. A party seeking to exceed these page limitations must apply to the Court for leave to do so, with copies to all counsel, no fewer than seven days before the date on which the memorandum is due. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 4/13/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/13/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/13/2020) (js) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application to Brunilda Rosario Estevez 809 West 177th Street Apt. 4F New York, NY 10033. (vba) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/10/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #3 Standing Order re Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases, to Brunilda Rosario Estevez 809 West 177th Street Apt. 4F New York, NY 10033. (aea) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Brunilda Rosario Estevez.(rdz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Brunilda Rosario Estevez.(rdz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.