This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:27:10 (UTC).

Ester Varoyan v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Ester Varoyan filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transamerica Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06371

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ester Varoyan

Defendants

Transamerica Life Insurance Company

DOES 1-100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George G Mgdesyan

Attorney at Mgdesyan Law Firm

4529 Sherman Oaks Avenue

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorneys

Vivian I Orlando

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culberson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Zina Yu

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for November 16, 2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer has included previously e-filed documents with prior active electronic headers intact to this current e-filing and as a result has rendered the current filings electronic header illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on July 22, 2020. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zina Yu counsel for Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Adding Zina Yu as counsel of record for Transamerica Life Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Yu, Zina) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on July 17, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Commonwealth General Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #2

Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of Defendant's Notice of Remova

1 #1

Exhibit A through I to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19VECV01846 Receipt No: ACACDC-27251581 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through I to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for November 16, 2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer has included previously e-filed documents with prior active electronic headers intact to this current e-filing and as a result has rendered the current filings electronic header illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on July 22, 2020. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zina Yu counsel for Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Adding Zina Yu as counsel of record for Transamerica Life Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Yu, Zina) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/14/2020, attached as Exhibit I.(jtil) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Ester Varoyan in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/26/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on July 17, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Commonwealth General Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19VECV01846 Receipt No: ACACDC-27251581 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through I to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less