This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 22:30:50 (UTC).

Estell v. Washington et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Estell filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Washington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian S. Miller and Beth Deere. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00815

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

Referral Judge

Beth Deere

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derrick Glenn Estell

Grady, AR 71644-0400

Defendants

Shipman

Dexter Payne

Marshall Reed

James Gibson

Walter Washington

O'Connor

Layton

Jude Ogbozor

Jonathan Martin

Douglas Boultinghouse

Brandon Carroll

Garrison

Ken Cunninham

Tyquarius Royal

Rickey Minor

Solomon Tobi

Whitney Knowles

Carolyn Wallace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sam P. Strange, Jr.

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

Brent Jay Eubanks

Attorney at Humphries, Odum & Eubanks

1901 South Broadway

Little Rock, AR 72206

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#12

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Extension to File Reply to #12 Summary Judgment Motion by Derrick Glenn Estell. (kdr) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSummons Reissued as to Jonathan Martin and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a new summons for Defendant Martin; and directing the Marshal to serve this Defendant with a summons and a copy of the #2 complaint at the address provided under seal without requiring prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/27/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Walter Washington served on 7/17/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Douglas Boultinghouse served on 7/17/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed. O'Connor served on 7/17/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Solomon Tobi served on 7/17/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tyquarius Royal served on 7/17/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Rickey Minor served on 7/17/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Carolyn Wallace served on 7/17/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Whitney Knowles.(Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Whitney Knowles (Eubanks, Brent) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER adopting #6 proposed findings and recommendations; and dismissing without prejudice Estell's claims against Cunningham, Layton, Reed, Carroll, Shipman, Gibson, and Payne. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/28/2020. (kdr) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Estell's claims against Defendants Cunninham, Layton, Reed, Carroll, Shipman, Gibson, and Payne be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/10/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Douglas Boultinghouse, Garrison, Whitney Knowles, Jonathan Martin, Rickey Minor, O'Connor, Jude Ogbozor, Tyquarius Royal, Solomon Tobi, Carolyn Wallace, Walter Washington and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Washington, Martin, Boultinghouse, O'Connor, Tobi, Royal, Minor, Wallace, Ogbozor, Knowles, and Garrison; directing the Marshal to serve these Defendants with summonses and copies of the #2 complaint, with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; and granting #3 motion to preserve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/9/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Varner Supermax Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/8/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Preserve Evidence by Derrick Glenn Estell. (ljb) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Derrick Glenn Estell. (ljb) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Glenn Estell. (ljb) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Layton is a litigant

Latest cases where O'Connor, Individually, and as Prison Guard Sergeant for Five Points C.F. is a litigant

Latest cases where Shipman is a litigant

Latest cases where GARRISON LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant