This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2022 at 08:06:42 (UTC).

Estech Systems IP, LLC v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Estech Systems IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Toyota Motor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estech Systems IP, LLC

Defendants

Toyota Motor Corporation

Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing Nort America, Inc.

Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc.

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fred Irvin Williams

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC - Austin

The Littlefield Building

601 Congress Avenue, SU 600

John Wittenzellner

Attorney at Williams, Simons, and Landis, PLLC - Philadelphia

1735 Market St., Suite A #453

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael Simons

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC - Austin

The Littlefield Building

601 Congress Avenue, SU 600

Todd Eric Landis

Attorney at Williams, Simons, and Landis, PLLC - Dallas

2633 Mckinney Ave., Suite 130 #366

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Ahtoosa Dale

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2121 N Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Brett Johnson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2121 N Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as toToyota Motor Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#12

(#12) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..( Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ahtoosa Dale on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Dale, Ahtoosa) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#10

(#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..( Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estech Systems IP, LLC (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Eric Landis on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Landis, Todd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Wittenzellner on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Wittenzellner, John) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Simons on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Simons, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

4 #3

Summons(es)

4 #2

Summons(es)

4 #1

Summons(es)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, ) Modified on 1/4/2022 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estech Systems IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Estech Systems, Inc. for Estech Systems IP, LLC. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as toToyota Motor Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. to 3/14/2022; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. to 3/14/2022; Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc. to 3/14/2022. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..( Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. to 2/28/2022; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. to 2/28/2022; Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc. to 2/28/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ahtoosa Dale on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Dale, Ahtoosa) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..( Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Estech Systems IP, LLC (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Eric Landis on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Landis, Todd) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Wittenzellner on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Wittenzellner, John) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Simons on behalf of Estech Systems IP, LLC (Simons, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Texas, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, ) Modified on 1/4/2022 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estech Systems IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Estech Systems, Inc. for Estech Systems IP, LLC. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8730407.), filed by Estech Systems IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Estech Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Corporation is a litigant