This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 09:07:55 (UTC).

Estech Systems, Inc. v. Howard Midstream Energy Partners

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Estech Systems, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Howard Midstream Energy Partners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00777

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Estech Systems, Inc.

Defendant

Howard Midstream Energy Partners doing business as Howard Energy Partners

Counter Plaintiff

Howard Midstream Energy Partners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan L. Hardt

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Michael Simons

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Chad Ennis

Attorney at Williams, Simons, and Landis, PLLC

327 Congress Ave, Ste 490

Austin, TX 78701

Fred I. Williams

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

Wasif Qureshi

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney St, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Estech Systems, Inc. by Howard Midstream Energy Partners.(Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#11

(#11) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases (Entered: 10/05/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (lad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#6

(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Todd E. Landis. (lad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to John Wittenzellner. (lad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Estech Systems, Inc.. to Howard Midstream Energy Partners d/b/a Howard Energy Partners (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13897084), filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Estech Systems, Inc. by Howard Midstream Energy Partners.(Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Howard Midstream Energy Partners answer due 10/19/2020. (lad) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 19, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wasif Qureshi on behalf of Howard Midstream Energy Partners. Attorney Wasif Qureshi added to party Howard Midstream Energy Partners(pty:dft) (Qureshi, Wasif) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/28/2020) (am). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Howard Midstream Energy Partners. (lad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Todd E. Landis. (lad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to John Wittenzellner. (lad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Estech Systems, Inc.. to Howard Midstream Energy Partners d/b/a Howard Energy Partners (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13897084), filed by Estech Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less