Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2021 at 08:20:11 (UTC).

Martha Estavillo v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Martha Estavillo filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia Donahue and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11002

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martha Estavillo

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan E Kassan

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Peter S Sessions

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Edith S Shea

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Life Insurance Company of North America. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 1/29/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Edith S Shea added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (et) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo, (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29339195 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo. (Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Martha Estavillo(pty:pla))(Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Life Insurance Company of North America. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 1/29/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Edith S Shea added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (et) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo, (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo. (Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29339195 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Martha Estavillo. (Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Martha Estavillo(pty:pla))(Kassan, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan E Kassan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter S Sessions