This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 20:40:35 (UTC).

Estate of Zamarie Chance v. Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Estate of Zamarie Chance filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fairfield Inn Suites by Marriott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malcolm J. Howard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malcolm J. Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estate of Zamarie Chance

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

Adam K. Collier

Newport Ramsey, LLC

MLP Manager, LLC

Newport Hospitality Group, Inc.

Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott

ATC Manager, LLC

Fairfield Inn by Marriott Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harold Boughman

Kurt D. Schmidt

Attorney at Schmidt Law

2505-B Nash St., P.O. Box 8065

Wilson, NC 27896

Harold Lee Boughman, Jr.

Attorney at Adams, Burge & Boughman

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel G. Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at Yates, McLamb & Weyher, LLP

Post Office Box 2889

Raleigh, NC 27602-2889

Rodney E. Pettey

Attorney at Yates, McLamb & Weyher, LLP

Post Office Box 2889

Raleigh, NC 27602-2889

 

Court Documents

#43

#42

41 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#41

38 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#38

#36

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#26

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet Initial Filing - Notice of Removal from Cumberland County

1 #13

Supplement Required Removal Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit Proposed Cumberland County Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit Declaration of Joshua M. David

1 #4

Exhibit N.C. Sec. of State Search Results

1 #3

Exhibit State Court A&P and Aff of Service

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Summonses

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this matter is REMANDED to the Superior Court of Cumberland County, North Carolina. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/7/2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #36 Motion to Remand. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of Cumberland County, North Carolina. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 4/7/2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard regarding #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, alternatively, pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5), #36 First MOTION to Remand. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #36 First MOTION to Remand filed by ATC Manager, LLC, Adam K. Collier, Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, MLP Manager, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Newport Hospitality Group, Inc., Newport Ramsey, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall conduct the Rule 26(f) conference, as appropriate, and submit their Rule 26(f) report to the court within twenty-one days of the court's disposition of Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 10/23/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Notice of Appearance filed by Harold Lee Boughman, Jr on behalf of Estate of Zamarie Chance. (Boughman, Harold) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference. (Lee, L.) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference filed by ATC Manager, LLC, Adam K. Collier, Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, MLP Manager, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Newport Hospitality Group, Inc., Newport Ramsey, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Memorandum in Support regarding #36 First MOTION to Remand filed by Estate of Zamarie Chance. (Schmidt, Kurt) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) First MOTION to Remand filed by Estate of Zamarie Chance. (Schmidt, Kurt) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to ATC Manager, LLC, Adam K. Collier, Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, MLP Manager, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Newport Hospitality Group, Inc., Newport Ramsey, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel G. Thompson, Jr on behalf of Adam K. Collier. (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel G. Thompson, Jr on behalf of ATC Manager, LLC. (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel G. Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott. (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel G. Thompson, Jr on behalf of Marriott International, Inc.. (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel G. Thompson, Jr on behalf of MLP Manager, LLC. (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel G. Thompson, Jr on behalf of Newport Hospitality Group, Inc.. (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel G. Thompson, Jr on behalf of Newport Ramsey, LLC. (Thompson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MLP Manager, LLC, Newport Hospitality Group, Inc., Adam K. Collier, Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Marriott International, Inc., Newport Ramsey, LLC, ATC Manager, LLC from Cumberland County North Carolina Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-4910. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5107757), filed by MLP Manager, LLC, Newport Hospitality Group, Inc., Adam K. Collier, Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Marriott International, Inc., Newport Ramsey, LLC, ATC Manager, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Summonses, #3 Exhibit State Court A&P and Aff of Service, #4 Exhibit N.C. Sec. of State Search Results, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua M. David, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Michael L. Pleninger (NR), #7 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew T. Carey (ATC), #8 Exhibit Declaration of Michael L. Pleninger (MLP), #9 Exhibit Declaration of Michael L. Pleninger (NHG), #10 Exhibit Declaration of Bancroft S. Gordon (MII), #11 Exhibit Declaration of Adam K. Collier (Ind), #12 Exhibit Proposed Cumberland County Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #13 Supplement Required Removal Cover Sheet, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Initial Filing - Notice of Removal from Cumberland County) (Thompson, Samuel) (Attachment 14 flattened and replaced on 9/19/2019) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newport Hospitality Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant