This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 09:25:09 (UTC).

Estate of Phillip Serrano et al v. City of Reno et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Estate of Phillip Serrano filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Reno. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert C. Jones and William G. Cobb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00536

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Jones

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Desiree Serrano

Estate of Phillip Serrano

Defendants

Reno Police Department

Reno, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell S Bisson

911 Law Group, 911 N. Buffalo Dr., Ste. 201

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Hughs

Attorney at Reno City Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 1900

Reno, NV 89505

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Reno, City of. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hughs, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendants Reno Police Department, Reno, City of. Responses due by 12/1/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/1/2021. (Hughs, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/17/2020)

4 #1

Summons Issued as to Reno Police Department

#4

(#4) SUMMONSES ISSUED as to City of Reno and Reno Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Reno Police Department) (AB) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Reno Police Department by Plaintiff Estate of Phillip Serrano. (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued CITY OF RENO by Plaintiff Estate of Phillip Serrano. (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Copy of Filing Fee Receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 PAID. Receipt No. NVLAS-071955) by Estate of Phillip Serrano, Desiree Serrano. Proof of service due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Filing Fee Receipt) (DRM) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Reno, City of. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hughs, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendants Reno Police Department, Reno, City of. Responses due by 12/1/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/1/2021. (Hughs, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONSES ISSUED as to City of Reno and Reno Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Reno Police Department) (AB) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Reno Police Department by Plaintiff Estate of Phillip Serrano. (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued CITY OF RENO by Plaintiff Estate of Phillip Serrano. (Bisson, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 PAID. Receipt No. NVLAS-071955) by Estate of Phillip Serrano, Desiree Serrano. Proof of service due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Filing Fee Receipt) (DRM) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less