This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 08:16:11 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MARY CARSWELL v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 ESTATE OF MARY CARSWELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julien Xavier Neals and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julien Xavier Neals

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE OF MARY CARSWELL

Cross Claimants and Defendants

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

JOHN DOE A TO Z

Cross Defendant and Defendant

JOHN DOE A TO Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN M. DEL VENTO, JR.

70 South Orange Avenue, Suite 150

Livingston, NJ 07039

Cross Claimant and Defendant Attorney

LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY

Attorney at WEINER LAW GROUP LLP

629 Parsippany Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN DOE A TO Z by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#5

(#5) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on March 11, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/31/2022. (sms) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#6

(#6) Joint Discovery Plan by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Proposed Order by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#8

(#8) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/8/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: R16 Scheduling Conference held on 3/11/2022. (sms) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/8/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Order by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint Discovery Plan by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on March 11, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/31/2022. (sms) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN DOE A TO Z by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13110568), filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY