This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 08:53:50 (UTC).

Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez et al v. Castillo et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Castillo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marilyn L. Huff and Linda Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01292

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn L. Huff

Referral Judge

Linda Lopez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez

G.D.

A.C.

Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez

Defendants

Isai Castillo

David Lisleit

City of San Diego

Does 1-25

David Nisleit

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eugene G Iredale

Attorney at Iredale & Yoo, APC

105 West F Street, 4Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-6036

Eugene G. Iredale

Attorney at Iredale & Yoo, APC

105 West F Street, 4Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-6036

Defendant Attorney

Seetal Tejura

Attorney at Office of the San Diego City Attorney

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities In support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Str

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C.. City of San Diego served. (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C.. David Nisleit served. (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C.. Isai Castillo served. (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#9

(#9) AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

7 #1

Declaration

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by A.C., Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez re #3 Amended Complaint filed by Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, A.C., G.D., Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez . (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION re #3 Amended Complaint Declaration of Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez as Successor in Interest to the Estate of Jose Castro Gutierrez by Plaintiffs A.C., Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez. (Iredale, Eugene) (jpp). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#3

(#3) WITHDRAWN PER #6 - AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C..New Summons Requested. (Iredale, Eugene) (jpp). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike by Isai Castillo, City of San Diego, David Nisleit. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike)(Tejura, Seetal)Attorney Seetal Tejura added to party Isai Castillo(pty:dft), Attorney Seetal Tejura added to party City of San Diego(pty:dft), Attorney Seetal Tejura added to party David Nisleit(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C.. City of San Diego served. (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C.. David Nisleit served. (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C.. Isai Castillo served. (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)New Summons Requested. (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by A.C., Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez re #3 Amended Complaint filed by Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, A.C., G.D., Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez . (Iredale, Eugene) (jmr). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION re #3 Amended Complaint Declaration of Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez as Successor in Interest to the Estate of Jose Castro Gutierrez by Plaintiffs A.C., Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez. (Iredale, Eugene) (jpp). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WITHDRAWN PER #6 - AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C..New Summons Requested. (Iredale, Eugene) (jpp). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Isai Castillo, City of San Diego, Does 1-25, David Lisleit ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15940830). Filed by G.D., Ana Clareth Ojeda Benitez, Estate of Jose Alfredo Castro Gutierrez, A.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1292-H-LL. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Iredale, Eugene)(sjt) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where G.D. is a litigant