This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 07:48:32 (UTC).

Estate of Jamie E. Moore v. Vermilion County et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Estate of Jamie E Moore filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Vermilion County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce, Eric I. Long, Michael M. Mihm and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02209

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Colin Stirling Bruce

Michael M. Mihm

Referral Judges

Eric I. Long

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estate of Jamie E. Moore

Defendants

Robinson

Walworth

Prooter

Ingram

. Fox

Young

Vermilion County

Patrick Hartshorn

Tyke Proctor

Karla Young

Richard Robinson

Branden Fox

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel P Kiss

Attorney at MEYER & KISS LLC

311 West Stratford Drive

Peoria, IL 61614

Louis J Meyer

Attorney at MEYER & KISS LLC

311 West Stratford Drive

Peoria, IL 61614

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dft K Ingram. Ingram waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Defendants Karla Young, Walworth, Branden Fox, Patrick Hartshorn, Tyke Proctor, Richard Robinson. Waivers sent on 7/30/2019, answers due 9/30/2019. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Young on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Ingram on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Prooter on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Walworth on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Robinson on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Fox on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sheriff Hartshorn on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Vermilion County on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Louis J Meyer on behalf of Estate of Jamie E. Moore (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3160912.), filed by Estate of Jamie E. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dft K Ingram. Ingram waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Defendants Karla Young, Walworth, Branden Fox, Patrick Hartshorn, Tyke Proctor, Richard Robinson. Waivers sent on 7/30/2019, answers due 9/30/2019. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/31/2019. Case reassigned to Judge Michael M. Mihm and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley for all further proceedings due to nature of case. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce, Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Young on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Ingram on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Prooter on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Walworth on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Robinson on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to C/O Fox on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sheriff Hartshorn on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Vermilion County on 07/30/2019. (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Louis J Meyer on behalf of Estate of Jamie E. Moore (Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3160912.), filed by Estate of Jamie E. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Meyer, Louis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. YOUNG is a litigant