This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2020 at 08:20:03 (UTC).

Estate of Eira Saenz et al v. Bitterman et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Estate of Eira Saenz filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bitterman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00848

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maria De Refugio Corral

Estate of Eira Saenz

Maria (I) De Refugio Corral

Defendants

Adams County

John P. Bitterman

Adams County, Colorado

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clarence Edwin Gamble

Attorney at Ramos Law, LLC

3000 Youngfield Street, Suite 200

Wheat Ridge, CO 80215

Joseph Philip Ramos, Jr.

Attorney at Ramos Law, LLC

3000 Youngfield Street, Suite 200

Wheat Ridge, CO 80215

Russell O. Newbold Araya

Attorney at Ramos Law, LLC

3000 Youngfield Street, Suite 200

Wheat Ridge, CO 80215

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney B. Kramer

Attorney at SGR, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80210

Jonathan N. Eddy

Attorney at SGR, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80210

Christopher J. Witte

Attorney at SGR, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80210

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (Dkt.#19 ), by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 05/15/2020.(rvill, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman. (Eddy, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#17

(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman All parties consent.. (Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

16 #1

Exhibit Original Answer red-lined

#16

(#16) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Answer red-lined)(Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#15

(#15) Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman. (Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman.(Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan N. Eddy on behalf of Adams County, Colorado, John P. BittermanAttorney Jonathan N. Eddy added to party Adams County, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan N. Eddy added to party John P. Bitterman(pty:dft) (Eddy, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Clarence Edwin Gamble (Gamble, Clarence) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Witte on behalf of Adams County, Colorado, John P. BittermanAttorney Christopher J. Witte added to party Adams County, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Witte added to party John P. Bitterman(pty:dft) (Witte, Christopher) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/31/2020. Consent Form due by 5/20/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

5 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Summons in Civil Action - Adams County

1 #1

Summons Summons in Civil Action - John Bitterman

#1

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman.(Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (Dkt.#19 ), by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 05/15/2020.(rvill, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman. (Eddy, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/12/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman All parties consent.. (Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Answer red-lined)(Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman. (Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman.(Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan N. Eddy on behalf of Adams County, Colorado, John P. BittermanAttorney Jonathan N. Eddy added to party Adams County, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan N. Eddy added to party John P. Bitterman(pty:dft) (Eddy, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Clarence Edwin Gamble (Gamble, Clarence) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/24/2020. Adams County, Colorado answer due 5/8/2020; John P. Bitterman answer due 5/8/2020. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (tsher, ) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service on Defendant John Bitterman by Plaintiffs Maria De Refugio Corral, Maria (I) De Refugio Corral, Estate of Eira Saenz. (Gamble, Clarence) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service on Defendant Adams County by Plaintiffs Maria De Refugio Corral, Maria (I) De Refugio Corral, Estate of Eira Saenz. (Gamble, Clarence) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Adams County, Colorado, John P. Bitterman. (Kramer, Courtney) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Witte on behalf of Adams County, Colorado, John P. BittermanAttorney Christopher J. Witte added to party Adams County, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Witte added to party John P. Bitterman(pty:dft) (Witte, Christopher) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/31/2020. Consent Form due by 5/20/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX094569. (alave, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Clarence Edwin Gamble added to party Maria De Refugio Corral(pty:pla), Attorney Clarence Edwin Gamble added to party Estate of Eira Saenz(pty:pla), filed by Estate of Eira Saenz, Maria De Refugio Corral. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in Civil Action - John Bitterman, #2 Summons Summons in Civil Action - Adams County, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gamble, Clarence) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adams County, Colorado is a litigant

Latest cases where Adams County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher James Witte

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Neal Eddy