This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:14 (UTC).

ESTATE OF DAVID W. FELTEN et al v. MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by ESTATE OF DAVID W FELTEN against MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17047

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF DAVID W. FELTEN

DANIELLE FELTEN

Defendant

MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Letter from Robert Lesko. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Midland National Life Insurance Company.. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

7 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#8

(#8) LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/8/2019. (kd) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Removal

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Christal Zook-Ballou, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number PAS-L-002085-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911605), filed by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal)(LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION/PETITION for by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Sammons Financial Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Removal

7 #3

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) CONSENT ORDER that the time in which defendant Midland National Life Insurance Company is required to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended until October 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/20/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

7 #2

Declaration of Christal Zook-Ballou

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER - The Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 is adjourned pending the outcome of the Motion to Dismiss.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/8/2019. (kd) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/8/2019. (kd) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6). Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Christal Zook-Ballou, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT ORDER that the time in which defendant Midland National Life Insurance Company is required to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended until October 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/20/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION/PETITION for by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Robert Lesko. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/19/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Midland National Life Insurance Company.. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Sammons Financial Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number PAS-L-002085-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911605), filed by MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal)(LESKO, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.