This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2021 at 11:39:40 (UTC).

Morris v. 3D Transportation, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Morris filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against 3D Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael D. Nelson and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00534

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anitia Morris

Estate of David Morris

Defendants

3D Transportation, Inc.

Michael Segelke

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francis E. Younes

Attorney at HIGH, YOUNES LAW FIRM

6919 Dodge Street

Omaha, NE 68132

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea A. Montoya

Attorney at ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1350, Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102

Stephen G. Olson, II

Attorney at ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1350, Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due March 1, 2022. Planning Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendants 3D Transportation, Inc., Michael Segelke.(Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant 3D Transportation, Inc..(Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/5/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by 3D Transportation, Inc., Michael Segelke (Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to defendants 3D Transportation, Inc. and Michael Segelke. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Requested as to Michael Segelke regarding Complaint, #1 . (Younes, Francis) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Requested as to 3D Transportation, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Younes, Francis) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4306493), by Attorney Francis E. Younes on behalf of Estate of David Morris, Anitia Morris (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Younes, Francis) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due March 1, 2022. Planning Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendants 3D Transportation, Inc., Michael Segelke.(Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant 3D Transportation, Inc..(Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant 3D Transportation, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESTRICTED HEARING INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/5/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by 3D Transportation, Inc., Michael Segelke (Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to defendants 3D Transportation, Inc. and Michael Segelke. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Requested as to Michael Segelke regarding Complaint, #1 . (Younes, Francis) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to 3D Transportation, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Younes, Francis) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4306493), by Attorney Francis E. Younes on behalf of Estate of David Morris, Anitia Morris (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Younes, Francis) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen G. Olson, II