This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2020 at 11:08:32 (UTC).

ESTATE OF CONNOR GOLEMBIEWSKI et al v. TUTHILL CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 ESTATE OF CONNOR GOLEMBIEWSKI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TUTHILL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01121

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Veronika Golembiewski

Estate Of Connor Golembiewski

Michael Golembiewski

Defendants

John DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)

ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)

MANNY MOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)

ABC COMPANIES 11-20 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)

John DOES 21-50 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)

John DOES 11-20 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)

Tuthill Corporation

ABC COMPANIES 21-50 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)

Tuthill Corporation doing business as Blue Mountain Resort

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M. Vlasac, Jr.

Attorney at VLASAC & SHMARUK, LLC

485B Route 1 South, Suite 120

Iselin, NJ 08840

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel J. McNulty

Attorney at Hueston, McNulty, PC

256 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 207

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Anthony W. Hinkle

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Philadelphia, PA 19422

William M. Brennan

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner PC

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

4 #4

Exhibit

4 #3

Exhibit

4 #2

Certification

4 #1

Brief

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER - AND NOW, this 14th day of August, 2020, it having been reported to the court that this matter has settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this matter CLOSED for statistical purposes only and the parties shall, as soon as practicable, submit an appropriate dismissal filing in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a).1 Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/14/2020. (ve) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Letter from John M. Vlasac, Jr., Esq. . (Vlasac, John) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Brennan on behalf of Tuthill Corporation (Brennan, William) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Tuthill Corporation.(Hinkle, Anthony) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION - Withdrawal and Entry of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Samuel J. McNulty terminated. Attorney Anthony W. Hinkle for Tuthill Corporation added. (Hinkle, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 10:15 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/6/2020. (ktt) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/6/2020. (ktt) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Case transferred electronically in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-18096 containing electronic documents. jw (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 06/30/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 06/30/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Attorney Vlasac. (VLASAC, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Edward J. Turro, Esq. re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District PA , #7 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TUTHILL CORPORATION. (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District PA (VLASAC, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by TUTHILL CORPORATION re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District PA or dismiss (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District PA (VLASAC, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District PA by TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(MCNULTY, SAMUEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to TUTHILL CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Exhibit to QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney, /s/ John M.Vlasac, Jr., Esq. by ESTATE OF CONNOR GOLEMBIEWSKI, MICHAEL GOLEMBIEWSKI, VERONIKA GOLEMBIEWSKI. (VLASAC, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown), ABC COMPANIES 11-20 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown), ABC COMPANIES 21-50 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown), JOHN DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown), JOHN DOES 11-20 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown), JOHN DOES 21-50 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown), MANNY MOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown), TUTHILL CORPORATION (d/b/a BLUE MOUNTAIN RESORT) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9972620) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VERONIKA GOLEMBIEWSKI, MICHAEL GOLEMBIEWSKI, ESTATE OF CONNOR GOLEMBIEWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VLASAC, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUTHILL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM M. BRENNAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY W. HINKLE