This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2020 at 07:31:04 (UTC).

Estate of Carmen Coral Morales-Rodger et al v. CPC Carolina PR, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2020 Estate of Carmen Coral Morales-Rodger filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CPC Carolina PR, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01397

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angel Luis Rodriguez-Morales

Patricia Maria Rodriguez-Morales

Fernando Julio Rodriguez-Morales

Carmen Coral Rodriguez-Morales

Carlos Eduardo Rodriguez-Morales

Lourdes Rebeca Rodriguez-Morales

Maria Teresa Rodriguez-Morales

Estate of Carmen Coral Morales-Rodger

Defendants

KRB Universal Investments, LLC

CPC Carolina PR, LLC

Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC

CVS PR Holding Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Trebilcock-Horan

Attorney at Trebilcock LLC

Bdg 11, Suite 105-A

Guaynabo, PR 00968

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A, Category Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit B, Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Noting #3 "Motion Submitting Documents." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/14/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION Submitting (Category and Civil Cover Sheets) filed by Thomas Trebilcock-Horan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit B, Civil Cover Sheet)(Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/11/2020. (arg) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6975483.), filed by Patricia Maria Rodriguez-Morales, Angel Luis Rodriguez-Morales, Lourdes Rebeca Rodriguez-Morales, Carmen Coral Rodriguez-Morales, Carlos Eduardo Rodriguez-Morales, Estate of Carmen Coral Morales-Rodger, Maria Teresa Rodriguez-Morales, Fernando Julio Rodriguez-Morales. Service due by 11/6/2020,(Trebilcock-Horan, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS PR Holdings Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CPC Carolina PR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC is a litigant