This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 07:26:32 (UTC).

Joyce v. Pierce County et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Joyce filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pierce County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David W. Christel and Robert J. Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-06119

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David W. Christel

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Brent Lee Heath, deceased

Marie Joyce

Defendants

Jane Doe Shanks

Pierce County

Carl Shanks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Clarence Otto

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY C OTTO

Po Box 1368, 2021 Se Sedgwick Rd

Port Orchard, WA 98366

Defendant Attorneys

Frank Cornelius

Attorney at PIERCE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (CIVIL)

955 Tacoma Ave S, Ste 301

Tacoma, WA 98402-2160

Peter J Helmberger

Attorney at PIERCE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (CIVIL)

955 Tacoma Ave S, Ste 301

Tacoma, WA 98402-2160

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks.(Helmberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-6022792) Attorney Anthony Clarence Otto added to party Marie Joyce(pty:pla), filed by Estate of Brent Lee Heath, deceased, Marie Joyce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Otto, Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/6/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/13/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/13/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pierce County on 11/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Marie Joyce. (Otto, Anthony) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter J Helmberger on behalf of Defendants Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Helmberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Frank Cornelius on behalf of Defendants Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Cornelius, Frank) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jane Doe Shanks mailed on 11/27/2019 (Cornelius, Frank) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Carl Shanks mailed on 11/27/2019 (Cornelius, Frank) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

5 #1

Summons - Pierce County

#5

(#5) Corrected Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Pierce County) (ERA) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks.(Helmberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • REFERRING JSR due (motion calendar tracking event) to: Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • JSR due 2/20/2020. (JL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/6/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/13/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/13/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pierce County on 11/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Marie Joyce. (Otto, Anthony) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter J Helmberger on behalf of Defendants Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Helmberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Frank Cornelius on behalf of Defendants Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Cornelius, Frank) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jane Doe Shanks mailed on 11/27/2019 (Cornelius, Frank) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Carl Shanks mailed on 11/27/2019 (Cornelius, Frank) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corrected Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Pierce County) (ERA) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Marie Joyce (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Otto, Anthony) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ISSUED IN ERROR, SUMMONS FORM INCOMPLETE, PLEASE RE-FILE COMPLETED DOCUMENT TO HAVE CORRECTED SUMMONS ISSUED Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pierce County, Carl Shanks, Jane Doe Shanks. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Pierce County) (ERA) Modified on 11/25/2019 (ERA). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Judge David W. Christel added. (ERA) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-6022792) Attorney Anthony Clarence Otto added to party Marie Joyce(pty:pla), filed by Estate of Brent Lee Heath, deceased, Marie Joyce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Otto, Anthony) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.