This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 08:15:48 (UTC).

ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Martin

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W. Craig

Attorney at CRAIG KELLEY & FAULTLESS

5845 Lawton Loop E Dr #1

Indianapolis, IN 46216

Scott Anthony Faultless

Attorney at CRAIG KELLEY & FAULTLESS

5845 Lawton Loop East Drive, Suite 1

Indianapolis, IN 46216

Christopher M. Barry

Attorney at CRAIG KELLEY & FAULTLESS

5845 Lawton Loop East Drive

Indianapolis, IN 46216

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Schiferl on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint by February 12, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Courts diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiffs jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/30/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN.(Faultless, Scott) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by February 10, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Courts diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiffs jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/27/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#8

(#8) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#7

(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (REO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barry on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Barry, Christopher) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Anthony Faultless on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Faultless, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Craig, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Craig on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Craig, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Timothy Martin. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5816753) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Craig, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hyslop, Chelsea) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Schiferl on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against FCA US LLC, filed by ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN.(Faultless, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint by February 12, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Courts diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiffs jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/30/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN.(Faultless, Scott) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by February 10, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Courts diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiffs jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/27/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (REO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barry on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Barry, Christopher) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Anthony Faultless on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Faultless, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Craig, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Craig on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Craig, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Timothy Martin. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5816753) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Craig, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less