This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2022 at 09:15:18 (UTC).

Esquilin v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Esquilin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-08309

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andre Esquilin

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony J Forzano

Attorney at The Forzano Law Firm

271 Avenue U

Brooklyn, NY 11223

Defendant Attorney

Marshall Todd Potashner

Attorney at Jaffe & Asher, LLP

445 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 405

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Verified Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#4

(#4) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Marshall T. Potashner dated October 4, 2022. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Marshall T. Potashner dated October 4, 2022., #1 Notice of Removal. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 11/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/6/2022) (kv) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Andre Esquilin..(Forzano, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J Forzano on behalf of Andre Esquilin..(Forzano, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval by the court, Andre Esquilin substitutes Anthony J. Forzano, as counsel of record in place of Igor Tarasov, Esq. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED., (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/13/2022) (ama) Modified on 10/28/2022 (ama). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/18/2022.(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint

10 #2

Exhibit 2 - Insurance Policy

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Exhibit A - Bronnberg Decision

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiff's Partial Opposition. Document filed by Andre Esquilin..(Forzano, Anthony) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bronnberg Decision).(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Marshall T. Potashner in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Insurance Policy).(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/18/2022.(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval by the court, Andre Esquilin substitutes Anthony J. Forzano, as counsel of record in place of Igor Tarasov, Esq. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED., (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/13/2022) (ama) Modified on 10/28/2022 (ama). (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J Forzano on behalf of Andre Esquilin..(Forzano, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Andre Esquilin..(Forzano, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Marshall T. Potashner dated October 4, 2022., #1 Notice of Removal. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 11/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/6/2022) (kv) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Marshall T. Potashner dated October 4, 2022. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marshall Todd Potashner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andre Esqulin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Todd Potashner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 812802/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26749706).Document filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Verified Complaint).(Potashner, Marshall) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant