This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2020 at 09:36:11 (UTC).

Esquibel v. City of Las Vegas et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Esquibel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Las Vegas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and James O. Browning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00960

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mark Anthony Esquibel

Las Vegas, NM 87701-4232

Mark Esquibel

Defendants

Diego Romero

City of Las Vegas

Jason Gage

Eric Padilla

Gerald Lozano

Mike Ortega

Pam Sandoval

Chris Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam C. Flores

Attorney at Kennedy, Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Erin L. Chavez

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy and Ives, P.C.

1000 2Nd St. Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Renni Zifferblatt

Attorney at Baker Law Firm

20 First Plaza, #402

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Jeffrey L. Baker

Attorney at The Baker Law Firm

20 First Plaza Nw Suite 402

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Second Amended Complaint

#12

(#12) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Las Vegas, Jason Gage, Chris Lopez, Gerald Lozano, Mike Ortega, Eric Padilla, Diego Romero, Pam Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint) (Baker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Mark Esquibel Withdrawal of Counsel - Erin L. Chavez (Chavez, Erin) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 14, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 11/10/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/14/2020. (cda) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #46

Exhibit

1 #37

Exhibit

1 #36

Exhibit

1 #35

Exhibit

1 #34

Exhibit

1 #33

Exhibit

1 #31

Exhibit

1 #30

Exhibit

1 #29

Exhibit

1 #28

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mike Ortega, Chris Lopez, Jason Gage, Diego Romero, City of Las Vegas, New Mexico, Gerald Lozano, Padilla Eric, Pam Sandoval from Fourth Judicial District Court, case number D-412-Cv-2019-00093. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Mike Ortega, Chris Lopez, Jason Gage, Diego Romero, City of Las Vegas, New Mexico, Gerald Lozano, Padilla Eric, Pam Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Baker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Las Vegas, Jason Gage, Chris Lopez, Gerald Lozano, Mike Ortega, Eric Padilla, Diego Romero, Pam Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint) (Baker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque is VACATED. Judge Browning will set an Initial Scheduling Conference at a later date. [THIIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#9) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Mark Esquibel Withdrawal of Counsel - Erin L. Chavez (Chavez, Erin) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 14, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 02:15 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 11/10/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/14/2020. (cda) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB047806 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Civil Cover Sheet by City of Las Vegas, Jason Gage, Chris Lopez, Gerald Lozano, Mike Ortega, Eric Padilla, Diego Romero, Pam Sandoval (Baker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mike Ortega, Chris Lopez, Jason Gage, Diego Romero, City of Las Vegas, New Mexico, Gerald Lozano, Padilla Eric, Pam Sandoval from Fourth Judicial District Court, case number D-412-Cv-2019-00093. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Mike Ortega, Chris Lopez, Jason Gage, Diego Romero, City of Las Vegas, New Mexico, Gerald Lozano, Padilla Eric, Pam Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Baker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin L. Chavez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam C. Flores

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy