This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2020 at 09:37:36 (UTC).

Esposito v. Walmart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Esposito filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Esposito

Defendants

D. H. Pace Company, Inc.

Walmart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark D. Prince

Attorney at Prince Law Firm

404 North Monroe Street

Marion, IL 62959

Defendant Attorneys

John P. Cunningham

Attorney at Brown & James, P.C. - Belleville

525 W. Main Street, Suite 200

Belleville, IL 62220

Denise E. Baker-Seal

Attorney at Brown & James, P.C. - Belleville

525 W. Main Street, Suite 200

Belleville, IL 62220

Rebecca L. Van Court

Attorney at DeFranco & Bradley, P.C.

141 Market Place, Suite 104

Fairview Heights, IL 62208

 

Court Documents

#23

#20

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Court File

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) 60 DAY ORDER. Judgment to enter 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 5/18/2020. (jlm) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Scheduling and Discovery Conference held on 5/18/2020. Attorney Mark Prince for Plaintiff and Attorney Rebecca Van Court for Defendant WalMart Inc. Parties advised the Court that the case has settled. 60 day order to enter. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/27/2020. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CJRA TRACK B assigned. Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 1:30 PM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly.(jlm) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-297-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Prince on behalf of Barbara Esposito (Prince, Mark) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Prince does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Prince, Mark) Modified on 4/7/2020 (cds). (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #7 Walmart, Inc. by Barbara Esposito. (Prince, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #13 DH Pace by Barbara Esposito. (Prince, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Court, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent:. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-297-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 4/13/2020 (cds) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by D. H. Pace Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent E.E. Newcomer Enterprises, Inc. for D. H. Pace Company, Inc.. (Baker-Seal, Denise) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Van Court, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal by Walmart, Inc.. (Van Court, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Van Court on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Van Court, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Denise E. Baker-Seal on behalf of D. H. Pace Company, Inc. (Baker-Seal, Denise) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by D. H. Pace Company, Inc.. (Cunningham, John) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Cunningham on behalf of D. H. Pace Company, Inc. (Cunningham, John) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County, case number 2020-L-4 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4144821), filed by D. H. Pace Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, John) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DH Pace Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denise E. Baker-Seal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca L. Van Court