This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2022 at 09:11:59 (UTC).

Espinoza v. Excel Staffing Companies, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Espinoza filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Excel Staffing Companies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory B. Wormuth and David H. Urias. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00670

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Presiding Judge

David H. Urias

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leroy Espinoza

Defendant

Excel Staffing Companies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew W Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard Burch

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3025

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher M. Moody

Attorney at Moody & Stanford PC

4169 Montgomery Blvd. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Repps D Stanford

Attorney at Moody & Stanford, PC

4169 Montgomery, Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leroy Espinoza. Excel Staffing Companies, LLC served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Excel Staffing Companies, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Leroy Espinoza.(Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Excel Staffing Companies, LLC (Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due November 15, 2022. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for November 29, 2022, at 3:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/28/2022. (emm) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • Docket(#7) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due November 15, 2022. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for November 29, 2022, at 3:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/28/2022. (emm) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Excel Staffing Companies, LLC (Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Excel Staffing Companies, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Leroy Espinoza.(Moody, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leroy Espinoza. Excel Staffing Companies, LLC served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Excel Staffing Companies, LLC. (dr) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8456460 re #1 Complaint filed by LEROY ESPINOZA (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EXCEL STAFFING COMPANIES, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by LEROY ESPINOZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Repps D Stanford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M. Moody