This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2020 at 08:58:14 (UTC).

Esos Rings, Inc. v. Tokenize Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Esos Rings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tokenize Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles J. Siragusa and Marian W. Payson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06289

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles J. Siragusa

Referral Judge

Marian W. Payson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESOS RINGS, INC.

Defendant

TOKENIZE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brett D. Goodman

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

875 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Ben Lewis Wagner

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

11682 El Camino Real, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

Ryan A. Lewis

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Craig C. Crockett

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Brian J. Capitummino

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

1900 Bausch & Lomb Place

Rochester, NY 14604

Jordan A. Sigale

Attorney at Dunlap Codding

225 W. Washington Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Marc A. Brockhaus

Attorney at Dunlap Codding, P.C.

609 W. Sheridan Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Julie L. Langdon

Attorney at Dunlap Codding, P.C.

609 W. Sheridan Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#43

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#42

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

35 #2

Petition of Ben Lewis Wagner with Admission Packet

7 #2

Memorandum in Support

7 #1

Declaration of Jordan A. Sigale, Esq. with attached Exhibits A-D

#7

#3

2 #1

Exhibit SUMMONS

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • Docket(#46) TEXT ORDER. Based upon the understanding discussed at the motion hearing on June 24, 2020, conducted by video conference utilizing Zoom, the Court issues this text order in anticipation of a written decision being filed by July 13, 2020. For the reasons to be set forth in that written decision, defendant Tokenize Inc.'s application, ECF No. 7, to stay the proceedings and plaintiff Esos Rings, Inc.'s application for a preliminary injunction, ECF No. 15, are both denied. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/29/20. (KAP) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa: All parties appearing by video conference. Brett Goodman, Esq., Craig Crockett, Esq., Ryan Lewis, Esq. and Ben Wagner, Esq. appearing on behalf of plaintiff. Julie Langdon, Esq. and Jordan Sigale, Esq. appearing on behalf of defendant. Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Esos Rings, Inc., #7 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case filed by Tokenize, Inc. Motions Submitted: 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case. Court reserves with respect to ruling on both motions. A ruling will be made by text order no later than 6/29/2020, with a written decision to follow soon thereafter. Court directs that defendant is not to ship its product before 2:00 p.m. on 6/29/2020, with the exception of the few units shipped by agreement of the parties prior to motion hearing. (Court Reporter Diane Martens.) (KJA) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Sealed Reply ISO Pl Motion dkt 30. (Attachments: #1 Dec ISO Pl AEO dkt 30-1) (BK) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Sealed Declaration ISO Mtn for Pl AEO dkt 25. (BK) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Sealed Response in Opposition dkt 22. (BK) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Sealed Opposition to Stay 19-1. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Declaration ISO Stay 19-2) (BK) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Sealed Memorandum Dkt 15-1. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Declaration 15-2) (BK) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice ; granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/23/20. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: regarding #35 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Ben Lewis Wagner, #38 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Ryan A. Lewis. Petition form is incomplete at question #3(c). Action needed: Please complete the petition form and re-file using the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies. (MD) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Ryan A. Lewis ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-3876390.) by Esos Rings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sponsoring Affidavit, #2 Petition of Ryan A. Lewis with Admission Packet)(Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case by Tokenize Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan A. Sigale, Esq. with attached Exhibits A-D, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Capitummino, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esos Rings, Inc.. Tokenize Inc. served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (CGJ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Tokenize Inc. (CGJ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESOS RINGS, INC.. (Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SUMMONS)(Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TOKENIZE INC. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3821636, filed by ESOS RINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Goodman, Brett) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less