This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2020 at 14:12:47 (UTC).

Esos Rings, Inc. v. Tokenize Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Esos Rings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tokenize Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01801

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Esos Rings, Inc.

Defendant

Tokenize Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phoenix Sung Pak

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Schlosser

Attorney at Meyer Suozzi, English, Klein, PC

900 Stewart Ave., Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

Matthew A. Marcucci

Attorney at Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.

990 Stewart Avenue, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: NOW THEREFORE, Esos and Tokenize stipulate and agree that this case be dismissed without prejudice by stipulation of all parties, with both parties to bear their own costs and fees, and further stipulate and agree that this action shall not be treated or asserted to be one of the two voluntary dismissals under FRCP 41(a)(1)(B) for purposes of the two-dismissal rule. Defendant has provided its consent and authorization for Plaintiff to use its electronic signature and to file this Stipulation of Dismissal on its behalf. Upon stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, this action is dismissed without prejudice upon the stipulated terms above. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/22/2020) (rro) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #9 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Parties are citing the two dismissal rule and consent for electronic signature by the other party in the order. (ad) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Esos Rings, Inc...(Pak, Phoenix) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kevin Schlosser dated April 10, 2020 re: pre-motion letter. Document filed by Tokenize Inc...(Schlosser, Kevin) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew A. Marcucci on behalf of Tokenize Inc...(Marcucci, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Schlosser on behalf of Tokenize Inc...(Schlosser, Kevin) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Phoenix Sung Pak. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Esos Ring, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/6/2020) (rro) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tokenize Inc...(sj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Phoenix Sung Pak to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Phoenix Sung Pak. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 3 (Federal Question); the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tokenize Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Esos Ring, Inc...(Pak, Phoenix) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pak, Phoenix) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tokenize Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18962299)Document filed by Esos Ring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Pak, Phoenix) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Esos Ring, Inc. is a litigant