This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 08:12:44 (UTC).

Esogbue v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Esogbue filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03233

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ambrose O Esogbue

Diberville, MS 39540

Respondents

United States Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER- Plaintiff's #6 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/21/19. (MSA) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

5 #1

IFP

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER: When bringing an action, a plaintiff must either pay a filing fee of $350, plus an administrative fee of $50, or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of fees. If Plaintiff fails to submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(EJA) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ambrose O Esogbue. (MSA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #9 Order. (MSA) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER- Plaintiff's #6 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/21/19. (MSA) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Ambrose O Esogbue. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (MSA) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Waive MIDP Requirements by Ambrose O Esogbue. (2 pages) (MSA) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ambrose O Esogbue. (MSA) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER: When bringing an action, a plaintiff must either pay a filing fee of $350, plus an administrative fee of $50, or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of fees. If Plaintiff fails to submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(EJA) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (EJA) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (EJA) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-03233-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT/Petition for Coram Nobis filed by Ambrose O Esogbue. (21 pages) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(EJA) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.