This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 18:07:23 (UTC).

Escueta v. Kia Motors Finance

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Escueta filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Kia Motors Finance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01293

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carminia Escueta

Defendant

Kia Motors Finance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yosef Steinmetz

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi, LLP

300 Cadman Plaza W., 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

Brandon T. White

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

Suite 3300, 701 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Kia Motors Finance. (White, Brandon) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kia Motors Finance. (White, Brandon) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T. White on behalf of Kia Motors Finance. (White, Brandon) Modified on 7/14/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 06/23/2021 by Carminia Escueta as to Kia Motors Finance. (Steinmetz, Yosef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carminia Escueta. Related case(s): No (Steinmetz, Yosef) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Kia Motors Finance. (TDC) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kia Motors Finance with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18301240) filed by Carminia Escueta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Steinmetz, Yosef) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant Kia Motors Finance's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time" (Doc. #8) is granted. Defendant may file its response to the complaint on or before August 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/14/2021. (ANL) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Kia Motors Finance. (White, Brandon) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kia Motors Finance. (White, Brandon) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T. White on behalf of Kia Motors Finance. (White, Brandon) Modified on 7/14/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 06/23/2021 by Carminia Escueta as to Kia Motors Finance. (Steinmetz, Yosef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carminia Escueta. Related case(s): No (Steinmetz, Yosef) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Kia Motors Finance. (TDC) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-1293-TPB-AAS. (SJB) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kia Motors Finance with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18301240) filed by Carminia Escueta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Steinmetz, Yosef) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kia Motors Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yosef Steinmetz