This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2022 at 07:24:15 (UTC).

Escoffier v. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 Escoffier filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul A. Engelmayer and Stewart D. Aaron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06588

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

Referral Judge

Stewart D. Aaron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Escoffier

New York, NY 10014

Defendant

Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mitchell B. Levine

Attorney at Fishman McIntyre Berkeley Levine Samansky, PC

521 Fifth Avenue, 17Th Fl.

New York, NY 10175

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Affidavit AOS

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) Modified on 8/3/2022 (kw). (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) Modified on 8/8/2022 (kw). (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/4/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. The conference shall be conducted by telephone. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/5/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#8

(#8) SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#9

(#9) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Amazon.Com, Inc., Other Affiliate Whole Foods Market, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Amazon.Com, Inc., Other Affiliate Whole Foods Market, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Mitchell Levine to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (kw) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketMAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6-7. Mailed to: Dana Escoffier 523 Hudson Street #4ES New York, NY 10014. (dsh) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. The conference shall be conducted by telephone. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/5/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/4/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) Modified on 8/8/2022 (kw). (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Mitchell Levine to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (kw) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc...(Levine, Mitchell) Modified on 8/3/2022 (kw). (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 100516/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26498016).Document filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit AOS).(Levine, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell B. Levine