This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2020 at 10:08:42 (UTC).

Escobar, Inc v. Dillard Hospitality Group et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Escobar, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Dillard Hospitality Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05375

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Escobar, Inc

Defendants

Dillard Hospitality Group

Tauheed Epps

Mychel Dillard

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gurjit Singh

Attorney at Law Office of Gurjit Singh

1131 West 6Th Street Suite 227

Ontario, CA 91762

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Louis Segal

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Nicole Phillis

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Order

#21

#20

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Exhibit Summons RE Other Defendant

4 #1

Exhibit Summons RE Other Defendant

#4

#3

#2

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#22) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Georgia, 1:20-cv-03033 filed 7/22/2020. (iv) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order) (iv) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA #19 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Stipulation is approved. The Clerk is hereby directed to TRANSFER this matter in its entirety to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. All deadlines, including deadlines to respond to the Complaint, are stayed pending completion of the transfer. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of the Northern District of Georgia filed by Defendants Mychel Dillard, Dillard Hospitality Group, Tauheed Epps. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Mychel Dillard(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Dillard Hospitality Group(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Tauheed Epps(pty:dft))(Phillis, Nicole) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc, upon Defendant Dillard Hospitality Group served on 6/27/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dillard Hospitality Group in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc, upon Defendant Mychel Dillard served on 6/27/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mychel Dillard in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Escobar, Inc, upon Defendant Mychel Dillard served on 6/20/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mychel Dillard in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc, upon Defendant Dillard Hospitality Group served on 6/20/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dillard Hospitality Group in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Escobar, Inc. (Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Dillard Hospitality Group. (iv) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Tauheed Epps. (iv) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons RE Other Defendant, #2 Supplement Summons RE Other Defendant, #3 Supplement Summons RE Other Defendant)(Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons RE Other Defendant, #2 Exhibit Summons RE Other Defendant)(Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc, identifying Escobar, Inc (Plaintiff), Dillard Hospitality Group (Defendant), Mychel Dillard (Defendant), Tauheed Epps (Defendant). (Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc. (Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26845028 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Escobar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Attorney Gurjit Singh added to party Escobar, Inc(pty:pla))(Singh, Gurjit) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESCOBAR is a litigant