This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

ESCHBACH v. GUST et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 ESCHBACH filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against GUST. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05945

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES ESCHBACH

Defendants

MICHAEL LEHMAN

OFFICER KEITH MERKEL

PAUL SHIPPER JR.

JOHN DOES 1-10

SCOTT A. GUST

CITY OF READING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARY SCHAFKOPF

Attorney at HOPKINS SCHAFKOPF, LLC

11 Bala Ave.

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

MATTHEW B. WEISBERG

Attorney at WEISBERG LAW PC

7 South Morton Ave

Morton, PA 19070

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL PASTINO

Attorney at LEHMAN PASTINO

25 South Church St

West Chester, PA 19382

DAVID J. MACMAIN

Attorney at THE MACMAIN LAW GROUP LLC

433 W. Market Street, Suite 200

West Chester, PA 19382

TRICIA M. AMBROSE

Attorney at MacMain, Connell & Leinhauser, LLC

433 W. Market Street, Suite 200

West Chester, PA 19382

MICHAEL B. DUBIN

Attorney at SEMANOFF, ORMSBY, GREENBERG & TORCHIA, LLC

2617 Huntingdon Pike

Huntingdon Valley, PA 19006

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit A: Promissory Note

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA M. AMBROSE on behalf of CITY OF READING, OFFICER KEITH MERKEL with Certificate of Service(AMBROSE, TRICIA) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#9

(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Plaintiff by MICHAEL LEHMAN. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit contract)(PASTINO, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/7/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF READING, SCOTT A. GUST, JOHN DOES 1-10, MICHAEL LEHMAN, OFFICER KEITH MERKEL, PAUL SHIPPER JR. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208460.), filed by JAMES ESCHBACH.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of CITY OF READING, OFFICER KEITH MERKEL with Certificate of Service(MACMAIN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

8 #3

Exhibit C: Stipulated Judgment

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES ESCHBACH. SCOTT A. GUST waiver sent on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit contract

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of JAMES ESCHBACH with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit B: Berks County Complaint

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OFFICER KEITH MERKEL. OFFICER KEITH MERKEL waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (MACMAIN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF READING. CITY OF READING waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (MACMAIN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by PAUL SHIPPER JR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B: Berks County Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Stipulated Judgment)(DUBIN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Plaintiff by MICHAEL LEHMAN. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit contract)(PASTINO, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/7/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by PAUL SHIPPER JR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B: Berks County Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Stipulated Judgment)(DUBIN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES ESCHBACH. SCOTT A. GUST waiver sent on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of JAMES ESCHBACH with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by TRICIA M. AMBROSE on behalf of CITY OF READING, OFFICER KEITH MERKEL with Certificate of Service(AMBROSE, TRICIA) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF READING. CITY OF READING waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (MACMAIN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OFFICER KEITH MERKEL. OFFICER KEITH MERKEL waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (MACMAIN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of CITY OF READING, OFFICER KEITH MERKEL with Certificate of Service(MACMAIN, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket5 Summons Issued as to CITY OF READING, SCOTT A. GUST, MICHAEL LEHMAN, OFFICER KEITH MERKEL, PAUL SHIPPER JR.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/18/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES ESCHBACH. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF READING, SCOTT A. GUST, JOHN DOES 1-10, MICHAEL LEHMAN, OFFICER KEITH MERKEL, PAUL SHIPPER JR. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208460.), filed by JAMES ESCHBACH.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.