This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2021 at 07:37:11 (UTC).

ESCARMANT v. AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 ESCARMANT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and Lurana S. Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61648

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERES ESCARMANT

Defendant

AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angel Ivan Rivera

Attorney at MAC Legal P.A.

11 Via De Casas Sur, Apt 204

Boynton Beach, FL 33426

Kristen Diane Montgomery

Attorney at MAC Legal PA.

3100 N. 29Th Ave, 33020

Hollywood, FL 33063

Malcolm Robert Pedraza

Attorney at MAC Legal PA

4601 Sheridan Street, Ste. 205

Hollywood, FL 33021-3432

Menachem Mendel Kass

2800 Sw 73Rd Way Apt 1611

Davie, FL 33314

Michael Abraham Citron

Attorney at MAC Legal, PA

3100 N. 29Th Court, Suite 100

Hollywood, FL 33020

Michael Rubin

Attorney at MAC Legal, P.A.

4601 Sheridan Street, Suite 205

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Eugene P. Murphy

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

777 Brickell Avenue, Suite 680

Miami, FL 33131

Audrey E. Goldman

Attorney at Robinson + Cole

777 Brickell Ave., Suite 680

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#10

9 #1

Exhibit

9 #9

Main Document

#8

7 #1

Exhibit

7 #7

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. (Goldman, Audrey) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. Answer due 9/24/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Audrey) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by CERES ESCARMANT Certificate of Interested Parties (Rubin, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, filed by CERES ESCARMANT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubin, Michael) Modified text to correct Party Defendant on 9/2/2021 (pcs). (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by CERES ESCARMANT re #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal (Rubin, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WITHDRAWN per DE #8 . AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, filed by CERES ESCARMANT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubin, Michael) Modified text to correct Defendant on 9/2/2021 (pcs). Modified on 9/2/2021 (pcs). (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA identifying Other Affiliate Interfinancial, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant, Inc., Other Affiliate American Bankers Insurance Group Inc., for AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA (Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. Answer due 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. (Goldman, Audrey) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14912370, filed by AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldman, Audrey) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 8/9/2021 (pcs). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EUGENE P MURPHY