This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2022 at 09:17:35 (UTC).

Escaray-Bruno v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Escaray-Bruno filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against U S Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan A. Lenard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-21925

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan A. Lenard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmer M. Escaray-Bruno

Defendant

Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Richard Dominguez

Attorney at Prada Urizar, PLLC

3191 Coral Way, Suite 500

Miami, FL 33145

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER CLOSING CASE. On July 8, 2022, Plaintiff filed a #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, wherein he dismissed the case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because "a notice of dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) is 'effective immediately upon filing,'" Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1277 (11th Cir. 2012) (quoting Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F.2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990) (per curiam)), this case is CLOSED, effective July 11, 2022, the date Plaintiff filed the #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 7/11/2022. (gie) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wilmer M. Escaray-Bruno (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mab) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Petition for Naturalization Hearing under 8 USC 1447(b) against Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15736908, filed by Wilmer M. Escaray-Bruno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Appendix Appendix of Supporting Documents)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant