This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2020 at 07:50:10 (UTC).

ES v. Best Western International Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 ES filed an Other lawsuit against Best Western International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Gren Scholer and Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Karen Gren Scholer

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

E.S.

ES

Defendants

Choice Hotels International, Inc.

Marriott International, Inc.

Best Western International Inc

Wyndham Hotels & Resorts LLC

Extended Stay America, Inc.

G6 Hospitality, LLC

Choice Hotels International Inc

Marriott International Inc

Wyndham Hotels and Resorts Inc

Extended Stay America Inc

G6 Hospitality LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W Mark Lanier

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm

6810 Fm 1960 West

Houston, TX 77069

Charla G Aldous

Attorney at Aldous Walker LLP

4311 Oak Lawn Ave., Suite 150

Dallas, TX 75219

Monica Cooper

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm, P.C.

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy N., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77064

Paul Pennock

Attorney at Weitz Luxenburg PC

700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Ordonez

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

Nichol L Bunn

Attorney at Lewis Bribois Bisgaard & Smith

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

Sara M Turner

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

420 20Th Street North, Suite 1400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Katriel Chaim Statman

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77010

Jason S Lewis

Attorney at DLA Piper

1900 N Pearl Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

James C Bookhout

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Allissa Pollard

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002-5005

Shannon E Dudic

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4700

Angela C Agrusa

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4704

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant G6 Hospitality LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #25 ]. Defendant G6 Hospitality LLC seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant G6 Hospitality LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/6/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#33

(#33) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #28 ]. Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/5/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#32

(#32) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Marriot International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #23 ]. Defendant Marriot International, Inc. seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant Marriot International, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/5/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

28 #1

Proposed Order

#28

(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Choice Hotels International Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

(#25) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by G6 Hospitality LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Agrusa, Angela) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

23 #1

Proposed Order

#23

(#32) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Marriot International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #23 ]. Defendant Marriot International, Inc. seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant Marriot International, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/5/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#6

(#6) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#4

(#30) RESPONSE filed by Wyndham Hotels and Resorts Inc re: #4 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pollard, Allissa) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case filed by E.S. (Lanier, W) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E.S.. (Lanier, W) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by ES. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10530418) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Lanier, W) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant G6 Hospitality LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #25 ]. Defendant G6 Hospitality LLC seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant G6 Hospitality LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/6/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #28 ]. Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/5/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Marriot International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #23 ]. Defendant Marriot International, Inc. seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant Marriot International, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/5/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Best Western International, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. [ECF No. #19 ]. Defendant Best Western International, Inc. seeks additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff has represented to the Court that it is unopposed to the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and it is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant Best Western International, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Protective Order by 3/25/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/5/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE filed by Wyndham Hotels and Resorts Inc re: #4 MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pollard, Allissa) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10679614) filed by ES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Paul Pennock added to party ES(pty:pla) (Pennock, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Choice Hotels International Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.'s unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Without Local Counsel. [ECF No. #21 ]. The Motion is GRANTED, and the Court permits Defendant Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. to proceed without local counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/3/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. [ECF No. #22 ]. The Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 4/6/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/3/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by G6 Hospitality LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Agrusa, Angela) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Monica Cooper. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 1/29/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10565050) filed by ES (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Monica) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The above-captioned case is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn, to whom a related case, F.M v. Best Western International, Inc., Civ. A. No. 3:19-cv-2901-M, is assigned. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/10/2020) (aaa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charla G Aldous on behalf of ES. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Aldous, Charla) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Best Western International Inc, Choice Hotels International Inc, Extended Stay America Inc, G6 Hospitality LLC, Marriott International Inc, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts Inc. (oyh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by E.S. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Lanier, W) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case filed by E.S. (Lanier, W) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E.S.. (Lanier, W) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by ES. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10530418) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Lanier, W) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where EXTENDED STAY AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. is a litigant