This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 12:02:53 (UTC).

Erwin et al v. Audie Price Inspection Inc

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Erwin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Audie Price Inspection Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jodi W. Dishman and Stephen P. Friot. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00506

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jodi W. Dishman

Stephen P. Friot

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy Erwin

Defendant

Audie Price Inspection Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard J Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W Dunlap

Attorney at Fibich Leebron Copeland Briggs & Josephson

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua W Solberg

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Paige H Good

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Application for Pro Hac Vice

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Erwin Consent

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 09:00 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 8/5/2020. (llg) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Audie Price Inspection Inc . (Good, Paige) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taylor A. Jones, provided that Ms. Jones submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 7/6/2020. (llg) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 7/2/2020. (rb) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 7/2/2020. (rb) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Audie Price Inspection Inc.(Good, Paige) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige H Good on behalf of Audie Price Inspection Inc (Good, Paige) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua W Solberg on behalf of Audie Price Inspection Inc (Solberg, Joshua) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTER ORDER. This action was filed on June 1, 2020 Doc. No. #1 . Plaintiff's counsel of record offices in Houston, Texas. The Local Rules of this Court require non-resident attorneys who do not maintain an office in Oklahoma to associate with local counsel. LCvR83.3(a). Accordingly, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to comply with this rule or move the Court for relief under LCvR83.3(c) no later than July 2, 2020. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 06/25/2020. (nv) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Taylor A. Jones Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-3181102 by Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated). Audie Price Inspection Inc served on 6/11/2020. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Josephson on behalf of Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated) (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3163996. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Audie Price Inspection Inc. (em) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Audie Price Inspection Inc filed by Randy Erwin(Individually), Randy Erwin(For Others Similarly Situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Erwin Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(em) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Burrage

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Jennings Burch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew W. Dunlap

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Josephson